+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- No Pending Motion; 01/14/2016
- Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, MA, VV; 01/14/2016; SJ 2
- Sen. D'Allesandro Moved Ought to Pass, DIV. 11Y-11N, MF; 01/14/2016
- Inexpedient to Legislate, DIV. 10Y-11N, MF; 01/14/2016; SJ 2
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 01/14/2016; SC1
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV, SJ 8
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/12/15; SC12
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 2/17/15, Room 103, SH, 1:00 p.m.; SC10
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Finance; SJ 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor