+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- II. Remainder Effective 09/13/13
- I. Section 2 & 3 effective as provided in Section 4
- Signed by the Governor on 07/15/13; Chapter 0226
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled; HJ52, PG.1711
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sen. Stiles Moved Concur with House Amendment #1990h, NT, MA, VV
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #1990h(NT): MA VV; HJ49, PG.1595-1596
- Floor Amendment #2013-1990h(NT) (Rep Shurtleff): AA VV; HJ49, PG.1595-1596
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for June 5 (Vote 15-4; RC); HC42, PG.1432
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 5/15/2013 11:00 AM LOB 207
- Executive Session: 5/21/2013 10:00 AM LOB 207
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 5/9/2013 11:00 AM LOB 207
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 4/23/2013 11:00 AM LOB 207
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Education; HJ35, PG.1191
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg;
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/28/13; SC13
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0736s, MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; SJ 7
- Committee Amendment 0736s, AA, VV; SJ 7
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0736s, 3/14/13; SC11
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 1/22/13, Room 103, LOB, 10:30 a.m.; SC5
On January 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Health, Education & Human Services; SJ 4
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor