+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On August 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/28/2023; Chapter 0176; Effective 09/26/2023
On June 30, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 HJ 17 P. 16
On June 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/29/2023); SJ 20
On June 8, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 06/08/2023 HJ 15 P. 10
On June 1, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/25/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC)
On May 18, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/25/2023 01:00 pm LOB 305-307
On March 23, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/13/2023 11:00 am LOB 305-307
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- ===ROOM CHANGE=== Hearing: 03/07/2023, Room 101, LOB, 09:00 am; SC 12
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/16/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 13
On February 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 02/14/2023 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 8