+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On December 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019; SJ 1
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pending Motion Ought to Pass with Amendment #2019-1168s; 03/28/2019; SJ 11
- Sen. D'Allesandro Moved Laid on Table, MA, VV; 03/28/2019; SJ 11
- Committee Amendment # 2019-1168s, AA, VV; 03/28/2019; SJ 11
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1168s, 03/28/2019; SC 15
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0819s, RC 24Y-0N, MA; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/14/2019; SJ 8
- Committee Amendment # 2019-0819s, AA, VV; 03/14/2019; SJ 8
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0819s, 03/14/2019; SC 13
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/12/2019, Room 103, LOB, 09:55 am; SC 10
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; SJ 4
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 14, 2019: Ought to Pass w/Amendment
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 24