+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, MA, VV === BILL KILLED ===; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/16/2023; SC 13
On February 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/16/2023, Room 101, LOB, 10:15 am; SC 10
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 5
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor