+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2023; Chapter 0105; Effective 08/19/2023
On June 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/08/2023); SJ 19
On June 13, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/08/2023 HJ 15
On May 18, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/18/2023 HJ 14 P. 8
On May 10, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/03/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC)
On April 11, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/19/2023 01:00 pm LOB 206-208
- Executive Session: 05/03/2023 09:00 am LOB 206-208
On April 7, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 04/06/2023 and referred to Judiciary
On March 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MF, VV; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
- Sen. Perkins Kwoka Moved Ought to Pass; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
- Sen. Perkins Kwoka Floor Amendment # 2023-1262s, AA, VV; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1262s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Special Order to 03/30/2023, Without Objection, MA; 03/16/2023 SJ 10
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/30/2023; SC 15
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/16/2023; SC 13
On January 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/01/2023, Room 100, SH, 02:15 pm; SC 8
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 5
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor