+ − Actions (14)
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- Died on Table
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Lay on Table (Rep. Ley): MA VV 06/05/2019 HJ 17 P. 71
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1713h
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 06/05/2019 (Vote 12-6; RC) HC 27 P. 17
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/28/2019 10:00 am LOB 208
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 05/14/2019 10:00 am LOB 208
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 04/23/2019 11:00 am LOB 208
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/17/2019 10:30 am LOB 208
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Judiciary HJ 11 P. 71
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0823s, RC 13Y-11N, MA; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; SJ 8
- Committee Amendment # 2019-0823s, RC 14Y-10N, AA; 03/14/2019; SJ 8
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0823s, 03/14/2019; SC 13
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/12/2019, Room 100, SH, 10:20 am; SC 10
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 4
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 14, 2019: Committee Amendment 0823s
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 24
March 14, 2019: Ought to Pass w/Amendment
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 24
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor