+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, RC 13Y-10N, MA === BILL KILLED ===; 02/22/2023; SJ 8
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/22/2023; SC 11
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Ways and Means; SJ 5
- Hearing: 02/01/2023, Room 100, SH, 10:15 am; SC 8
+ − Vote
February 22, 2023: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 23
Details:
+
−
- Jeb Bradley:
- David Watters: Nay
- Sharon Carson: Yea
- Donna Soucy: Nay
- Lou D'Allesandro: Nay
- Regina Birdsell: Yea
- Shannon Chandley: Nay
- James Gray: Yea
- Keith Murphy: Yea
- Cindy Rosenwald: Nay
- Kevin Avard: Yea
- Ruth Ward: Yea
- Daniel Innis: Yea
- Debra Altschiller: Nay
- Donovan Fenton: Nay
- Timothy Lang: Yea
- Howard Pearl: Yea
- Daryl Abbas: Yea
- Suzanne Prentiss: Nay
- Rebecca Whitley: Nay
- Bill Gannon: Yea
- Rebecca Perkins Kwoka: Nay
- Denise Ricciardi: Yea
- Carrie Gendreau: Yea
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor