+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 22, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
- Full Committee Work Session: 06/07/2023 10:00 am LOB 206-208
On April 11, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/03/2023 09:00 am LOB 206-208
On April 6, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/19/2023 10:00 am LOB 206-208
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Judiciary
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sen. Carson Moved to Remove SB 255 from the Consent Calendar; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0835s, AA, VV; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
- Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2023-0935s; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
- Sen. Carson Withdraws Floor Amendment # 2023-0935s; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
- Sen. Carson Moved Reconsideration on Committee Amendment 2023-0835, MA, VV; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0835s, AF, VV; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
- Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2023-0935s, AA, VV; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0935s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0835s, 03/16/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 13
On February 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/14/2023, Room 100, SH, 02:30 pm; SC 10
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 5
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor