+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, MA, VV === BILL KILLED ===; 02/09/2023; SJ 6
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; CC; 02/09/2023; SC 9
On January 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/01/2023, Room 100, SH, 02:00 pm; SC 8
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 5