+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On August 30, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2023 10:15 am LOB 206-208
On April 26, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/25/2023 09:00 am LOB 206-208
On April 25, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On April 13, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/25/2023 09:00 am LOB 206-208
On March 29, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/23/2023 and referred to Children and Family Law
On March 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sen. Abbas Floor Amendment # 2023-1186s, RC 13Y-10N, AA; 03/23/2023; SJ 11
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1186s, RC 13Y-10N, MA; OT3rdg; 03/23/2023; SJ 11
- Sen. Abbas Moved Ought to Pass; 03/23/2023; SJ 11
- Rereferred to Committee, MF, VV; 03/23/2023; SJ 11
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Special Order to 03/23/2023, Without Objection, MA; 03/09/2023 SJ 9
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/23/2023; SC 14
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/09/2023; SC 12
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/21/2023, Room 100, SH, 01:45 pm; SC 11
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 5
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 23, 2023: Floor Amendment
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 23
- Absent: 1