+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 18, 2023 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 05/18/2023 HJ 14 P. 8
On May 10, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 05/03/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC)
On April 11, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/03/2023 09:00 am LOB 206-208
On March 29, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/12/2023 02:30 pm LOB 206-208
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Judiciary
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, MF, VV; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
- Sen. Gray Moved Ought to Pass; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
- Sen. Gray Floor Amendment # 2023-1040s, AA, VV; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1040s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/16/2023; SC 13
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/21/2023, Room 100, SH, 01:30 pm; SC 11
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 5