+ − Actions (11)
On July 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/01/2021; Chapter 0100; Effective 07/01/2021
On June 25, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/24/2021); SJ 20
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 06/03/2021 HJ 8 P. 84
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 24-0; CC) HC 26 P. 14
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/16/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97636968924 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Ways and Means HJ 4 P. 48
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: RC 24Y-0N, MA; OT3rdg; 02/04/2021; SJ 3
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/04/2021; SC 9
On January 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remote Hearing: 01/13/2021, 01:00 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; SC 6
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Ways and Means; SJ 3
+ − Vote
February 4, 2021: Ought to Pass
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 24
Details:
+
−
- Jeb Bradley: Yea
- David Watters: Yea
- Sharon Carson: Yea
- John Reagan: Yea
- Donna Soucy: Yea
- Lou D'Allesandro: Yea
- Chuck Morse: Yea
- Regina Birdsell: Yea
- Gary Daniels: Yea
- James Gray: Yea
- Cindy Rosenwald: Yea
- Kevin Avard: Yea
- Harold French: Yea
- Erin Hennessey: Yea
- Bob Giuda: Yea
- Ruth Ward: Yea
- Jay Kahn: Yea
- Kevin Cavanaugh: Yea
- Tom Sherman: Yea
- Suzanne Prentiss: Yea
- Rebecca Whitley: Yea
- Bill Gannon: Yea
- Rebecca Perkins Kwoka: Yea
- Denise Ricciardi: Yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor