+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 05/03/2016; Chapter 0039; Effective 07/02/2016
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled 04/20/2016 HJ 36 P. 51
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 04/21/2016); SJ 15
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-1436e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 04/14/2016); SJ 14
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-1436e: AA VV 04/06/2016 HJ 31 P. 25
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 04/06/2016 HJ 31 P. 4
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/06/2016 (Vote 17-0; CC) HC 21 P. 7
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/15/2016 03:00 PM LOB 207
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/15/2016 02:15 PM LOB 207
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced 01/28/2016 and referred to Education HJ 10 P. 10
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2411s, NT, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 01/06/2016; SJ 1
- Committee Amendment 2411s, NT, AA, VV; 01/06/2016
On October 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2411s, NT, 1/6/16; SC49
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 9/22/15, Room 103, LOB, 10:10 a.m.; SC34
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV, SJ 8
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/12/15; Vote 5-0; CC; SC12
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 2/17/15, Room 103, LOB, 9:00 a.m.; SC10
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Education; SJ 5
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor