+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, RC 14Y-10N, MA === BILL KILLED ===; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/16/2023; SC 13
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/21/2023, Room 100, SH, 02:15 pm; SC 11
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 5
+ − Vote
March 16, 2023: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 24