+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, MA, VV === BILL KILLED ===; 01/06/2016; SJ 1
On October 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 1/6/16; SC49
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 9/22/15, Room 103, LOB, 10:00 a.m.; SC34
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV, SJ 8
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/12/15; Vote 5-0; CC; SC12
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 3/3/15, Room 103, LOB, 9:00 a.m.; SC11
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Education; SJ 6