+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 5, 2023 in the House:
- Division III Work Session: 10/03/2023 10:00 am LOB 210-211 HC 36
On June 14, 2023 in the House:
- Division Work Session: 06/27/2023 10:00 am LOB 210-211
On June 1, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On May 31, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 06/01/2023 10:00 am LOB 210-211
On May 22, 2023 in the House:
- Division Work Session: 05/23/2023 10:00 am LOB 210-211
On May 18, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-1754h: AA DV 249-127 05/18/2023 HJ 14 P. 42
- FLAM # 2023-1861h (Reps. Nagel, Kofalt): AA DV 359-18 05/18/2023 HJ 14 P. 43
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1754h 2023-1861h: MA VV 05/18/2023 HJ 14 P. 43
- Referred to Finance 05/18/2023 HJ 14 P. 43
On May 11, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Without Recommendation 05/10/2023 (Vote ; RC)
On May 4, 2023 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/10/2023 11:00 am LOB 205-207
On April 26, 2023 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 05/03/2023 09:30 am LOB 201-203
On April 19, 2023 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/26/2023 09:30 am LOB 205-207
On April 12, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/19/2023 09:30 am LOB 201-203
On April 7, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 04/06/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs
On March 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
On March 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/30/2023; SC 15
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0867s, MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0867s, AA, VV; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0867s, 03/16/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 13
On February 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/16/2023, Room 101, LOB, 09:15 am; SC 10
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 5
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor