+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/19/2019; Chapter 279; Effective 09/17/2019
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/27/2019 HJ 20 P. 53
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); SJ 21
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sen. Watters Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 06/13/2019; SJ 20
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1753h: MA VV 06/05/2019 HJ 17 P. 23
- Amendment # 2019-1753h: AA VV 06/05/2019 HJ 17 P. 23
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1753h for 06/05/2019 (Vote 13-0; CC) HC 27 P. 8
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/21/2019 01:00 pm LOB 203
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 05/14/2019 10:00 am LOB 203
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/30/2019 01:30 pm LOB 203
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/23/2019 11:00 am LOB 203
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Transportation HJ 11 P. 71
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0621s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; SJ 7
- Committee Amendment # 2019-0621s, AA, VV; 03/07/2019; SJ 7
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0621s, 03/07/2019; SC 12
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/14/2019; SJ 5
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/14/2019; Vote 5-0; CC SC 10
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/05/2019, Room 103, LOB, 01:00 pm; SC 9
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Transportation; SJ 4