+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 20, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On April 12, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/19/2023 11:30 am LOB 201-203
On March 29, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/12/2023 11:15 am LOB 205-207
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0653s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/09/2023; SJ 9
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0653s, AA, VV; 03/09/2023; SJ 9
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0653s, 03/09/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 12
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/22/2023, Room 100, SH, 09:00 am; SC 11
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 5