+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report: Not Filed
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conferee Change; Senator Feltes Replaces Senator Cavanaugh; SJ 21
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/19/2019, 09:00 am, Room 101, LOB
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Conferee Change: Rep. Abel Replaces Rep. Muscatel 06/13/2019 HJ 19 P. 20
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker Appoints: Reps. Butler, Williams, Muscatel, Fargo 06/06/2019 HJ 18 P. 45
- House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Butler): MA VV 06/06/2019 HJ 18 P. 45
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- President Appoints: Senators Cavanaugh, Morgan, French; (In Recess 06/06/2019); SJ 20
- Sen. Cavanaugh Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, MA, VV; (In Recess 06/06/2019); SJ 20
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2129h: MA VV 06/05/2019 HJ 17 P. 38
- Amendment # 2019-2129h: AA DV 208-144 06/05/2019 HJ 17 P. 38
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2129h for 06/05/2019 (Vote 12-8; RC) HC 27 P. 11
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/21/2019 11:00 am LOB 302
- Full Committee Work Session: 05/16/2019 09:30 am LOB 302
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 05/02/2019 10:30 am LOB 302
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/24/2019 01:00 pm LOB 302
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 11 P. 71
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendments 2019-0841s, and 2019-1055s, RC 14Y-10N, MA; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; SJ 8
- Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2019-1057s, RC 10Y-14N, AF; 03/14/2019; SJ 8
- Sen. Feltes Floor Amendment # 2019-1055s, AA, VV; 03/14/2019; SJ 8
- Committee Amendment # 2019-0841s, AA, VV; 03/14/2019; SJ 8
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0841s, 03/14/2019; SC 13
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/19/2019, Room 100, SH, 01:30 pm; SC 11
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; SC 8
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
March 14, 2019: Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment 1057s
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 24
March 14, 2019: Ought to Pass w/Amendment
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 24
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor