+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV; 03/09/2023; SJ 9
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/09/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 12
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/14/2023, Room 103, SH, 09:45 am; SC 10
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 5
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor