+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On March 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
On March 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/30/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 15
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/14/2023, Room 103, LOB, 09:30 am; SC 10
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; SJ 5