+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 24, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On May 11, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/17/2023 10:15 am LOB 104
On May 10, 2023 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 05/17/2023 10:00 am LOB 104
On May 4, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 05/10/2023 11:00 am LOB 104
- Full Committee Work Session: 05/10/2023 11:15 am LOB 104
On April 7, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 04/06/2023 and referred to Special Committee on Childcare
On March 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, MF, VV; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
- Sen. Gray Moved Ought to Pass; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
- Sen. Gray Floor Amendment # 2023-1256s, AA, VV; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1256s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/30/2023; SC 15
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- ==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 03/07/2023, Room 103, LOB, 09:15 am; SC 12
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; SJ 5
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor