+ − Actions (12)
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- Died on Table
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Lay on Table (Rep. Ley): MA VV 05/23/2019 HJ 16 P. 49
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 05/23/2019 (Vote 13-6; RC) HC 25 P. 12
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/14/2019 10:00 am LOB 203
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/30/2019 11:30 am LOB 203
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Transportation HJ 11 P. 74
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1171s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/27/2019; SJ 10
- Committee Amendment # 2019-1171s, AA, VV; 03/27/2019; SJ 10
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1171s, 03/27/2019; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 15
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- ==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 03/05/2019, Room 103, LOB, 01:45 pm; SC 12
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Transportation; SJ 4
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor