+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, RC 14Y-10N, MA === BILL KILLED ===; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/16/2023; SC 13
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/31/2023, Room 103, LOB, 10:00 am; SC 8
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; SJ 5
+ − Vote
March 16, 2023: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 24
Details:
+
−
- Jeb Bradley: Yea
- David Watters: Nay
- Sharon Carson: Yea
- Donna Soucy: Nay
- Lou D'Allesandro: Nay
- Regina Birdsell: Yea
- Shannon Chandley: Nay
- James Gray: Yea
- Keith Murphy: Yea
- Cindy Rosenwald: Nay
- Kevin Avard: Yea
- Ruth Ward: Yea
- Daniel Innis: Yea
- Debra Altschiller: Nay
- Donovan Fenton: Nay
- Timothy Lang: Yea
- Howard Pearl: Yea
- Daryl Abbas: Yea
- Suzanne Prentiss: Nay
- Rebecca Whitley: Nay
- Bill Gannon: Yea
- Rebecca Perkins Kwoka: Nay
- Denise Ricciardi: Yea
- Carrie Gendreau: Yea
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor