+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sen. Carson Moved to Remove SB 219 from the Consent Calendar; 03/09/2023; SJ 9
- Inexpedient to Legislate, MF, VV; 03/09/2023; SJ 9
- Sen. Carson Moved to Rerefer to Committee, MA, VV; 03/09/2023; SJ 9
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; CC; 03/09/2023; SC 12
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- ==RECONVENE== Hearing: 02/21/2023, Room 101, LOB, 09:00 am; SC 11
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: ===RECESSED=== 02/14/2023, Room 101, LOB, 09:30 am; SC 10
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Education; SJ 5