+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On September 5, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2023 10:30 am LOB 205-207 HC 36
On May 10, 2023 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 05/30/2023 01:00 pm LOB 205-207
On May 3, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On April 26, 2023 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/03/2023 10:15 am LOB 205-207
- Full Committee Work Session: 05/03/2023 09:30 am LOB 205-207
On April 12, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/25/2023 10:00 am LOB 205-207
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/25/2023 10:30 am LOB 205-207
On April 7, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 04/06/2023 and referred to Education
On March 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
On March 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/30/2023; SC 15
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/16/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 13
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/14/2023, Room 101, LOB, 09:15 am; SC 10
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Education; SJ 5
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor