+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On August 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 08/04/2023; Chapter 0226; Effective 07/01/2023
On June 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/15/2023); SJ 20
On June 28, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/15/2023 HJ 16 P. 16
On June 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-2183e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 06/15/2023); SJ 20
On June 21, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-2183e: AA VV (in recess of) 06/15/2023 HJ 16 P. 15
On June 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sen. Ward Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 06/01/2023; SJ 16
On May 4, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-1394h: AA VV 05/04/2023 HJ 13 P. 6
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1394h: MA VV 05/04/2023 HJ 13 P. 6
On April 26, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1394h 04/19/2023 (Vote 18-2; CC)
On April 12, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/19/2023 10:00 am LOB 205-207
On March 23, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/29/2023 02:00 pm LOB 205-207
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Education
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0679s, AA, VV; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0679s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0679s, 03/16/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 13
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/14/2023, Room 101, LOB, 09:45 am; SC 10
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Education; SJ 5
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor