+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Refer to Interim Study, MA, VV; 01/03/2024; SJ 1
On December 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/03/2024, Vote 5-0; SC 49
On March 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sen. Whitley and Sen. Birdsell requested a roll call, 03/09/2023; SJ 9
- The Chair withdrew the roll call, 03/09/2023; SJ 9
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, RC 0Y-24N, MF; 03/09/2023; SJ 9
- Sen. Carson Moved to Rerefer to Committee, MA, VV; 03/09/2023; SJ 9
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/09/2023; SC 12
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/07/2023, Room 101, LOB, 09:30 am; SC 9
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Education; SJ 5
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor