+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/02/15; Chapter 0076; Effective 08/01/2015
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 5/14/2015); SJ 15
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); HJ 41, PG. 1781
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sen. Carson Concurs with House Amendment #0973h, MA, VV; SJ 12
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0973h: MA VV; HJ 34, PG. 1537
- Amendment #0973h: AA VV; HJ 34, PG. 1537
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0973h for Apr 15 (Vote 13-0; CC); HC 29, PG. 1302
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/24/2015 10:00 AM LOB 306
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 3/17/2015 10:00 AM LOB 306
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; HJ 22, PG. 628
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0045s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 4
- Committee Amendment 0045s, AA, VV
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0045s, 1/29/15; Vote 5-0; CC; SC7
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 1/21/15, Room 101, LOB, 9:15 a.m.; SC6
On January 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 4
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor