+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 4, 2023 in the House:
- Lay SB209 on Table (Rep. Harriott-Gathright): MA DV 357-9 05/04/2023 HJ 13 P. 20
On April 13, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Without Recommendation 03/30/2023 (Vote ; RC)
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/29/2023 01:45 pm LOB 202-204
- Executive Session: 03/30/2023 09:00 am LOB 202-204
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0654s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/09/2023; SJ 9
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0654s, AA, VV; 03/09/2023; SJ 9
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0654s, 03/09/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 12
On February 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/16/2023, Room 103, SH, 09:45 am; SC 10
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 5
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor