+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On August 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 08/04/2023; Chapter 0224; Effective 10/03/2023
On July 19, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 HJ 17 P. 18
On July 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/29/2023); SJ 20
On June 29, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report # 2023-2207c, Adopted, VV; 06/29/2023; SJ 20
On June 29, 2023 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report 2023-2207c: Adopted, VV 06/29/2023 HJ 17 P. 16
On June 22, 2023 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report # 2023-2207c Filed 06/22/2023; As Amended by the House + New Amendment HJ 16
On June 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/19/2023, 02:00 pm, Room 103, SH
On June 15, 2023 in the House:
- House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. C. McGuire): MA VV 06/15/2023 HJ 16 P. 11
- Speaker Appoints: Reps. Goley, Grote, Sirois, Simon 06/15/2023 HJ 16 P. 11
On June 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sen. Pearl Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, MA, VV; 06/15/2023; SJ 19
- President Appoints: Senators Pearl, Gendreau, Perkins Kwoka; 06/15/2023; SJ 19
On June 8, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-2010h: AA VV 06/08/2023 HJ 15 P. 7
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-2010h: MA VV 06/08/2023 HJ 15 P. 7
On May 25, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-2010h (NT) 05/24/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC)
On May 19, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/24/2023 10:30 am LOB 306-308
On May 17, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2023-1915h: 05/22/2023 10:00 am LOB 306-308
On May 11, 2023 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Subcommittee Work Session: 05/24/2023 09:00 am LOB 306-308
On May 1, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/24/2023 10:30 am LOB 306-308
- ==RECESSED== Subcommittee Work Session: 05/03/2023 10:00 am LOB 306-308
On April 19, 2023 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 04/26/2023 02:00 pm LOB 306-308
On April 14, 2023 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/29/2023 01:30 pm LOB 306-308
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/29/2023 01:30 pm LOB 306-308
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0302s, AA, VV; 02/22/2023; SJ 8
- Sen. Birdsell Floor Amendment # 2023-0638s, AA, VV; 02/22/2023; SJ 8
- Ought to Pass with Amendments 2023-0302s and 2023-0638s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/22/2023; SJ 8
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Special Order to Next Session, Without Objection, MA; 02/09/2023; SJ 6
- Sen. Birdsell Moved to Remove SB 207 from the Consent Calendar; 02/09/2023; SJ 6
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0302s, 02/22/2023; SC 11
On February 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0302s, 02/09/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 9A
On January 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/02/2023, Room 103, SH, 09:00 am; SC 8
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 5
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor