+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On August 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/28/2023; Chapter 0171; Effective 07/01/2023
On June 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/15/2023); SJ 20
On June 28, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/15/2023 HJ 16 P. 16
On June 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sen. Pearl Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 06/15/2023; SJ 19
On June 8, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-2080h: AA VV 06/08/2023 HJ 15 P. 44
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-2080h: MA VV 06/08/2023 HJ 15 P. 44
On June 1, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-2080h 06/01/2023 (Vote 24-1; RC)
On May 31, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 06/01/2023 10:00 am LOB 210-211
On May 22, 2023 in the House:
- Division Work Session: 05/31/2023 01:30 pm LOB 212
On May 4, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/04/2023 HJ 13 P. 14
- Referred to Finance 05/04/2023 HJ 13 P. 14
On April 13, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/29/2023 01:00 pm LOB 306-308
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/29/2023 (Vote 16-0; CC)
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/29/2023 01:00 pm LOB 306-308
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0675s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/09/2023; SJ 9
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0675s, AA, VV; 03/09/2023; SJ 9
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0675s, 03/09/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 12
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/08/2023, Room 103, SH, 09:45 am; SC 9
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 5
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor