+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 6, 2023 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2023 10:00 am LOB 302-304 HC 36
On August 30, 2023 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/06/2023 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On May 10, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On May 3, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/10/2023 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On April 12, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/26/2023 10:30 am LOB 302-304
On April 7, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 04/06/2023 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs
On March 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Special Order to the end of the Regular Calendar, Without Objection, MA; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
- Committee Amendment # 2023-1135s, AA, VV; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
- Sen. Lang Floor Amendment # 2023-1264s, AA, VV; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
- Ought to Pass with Amendments 2023-1135s and 2023-1264s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1135s, 03/30/2023; SC 15
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/31/2023, Room 100, SH, 09:45 am; SC 8
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 5