+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/02/2017; Chapter 0086; Effective 08/01/2017
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/04/2017 HJ 15 P. 47
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 04/27/2017); SJ 16
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-1539e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 04/27/2017); SJ 16
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-1539e: AA VV 04/20/2017 HJ 14 P. 25
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 04/20/2017 HJ 14 P. 8
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/20/2017 (Vote 17-0; CC) HC 20 P. 6
- Executive Session: 03/29/2017 LOB 208
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/15/2017 01:30 PM LOB 208
- Introduced 02/16/2017 and referred to Judiciary HJ 8 P. 46
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/16/2017; SJ 6
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/16/2017; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 10
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/07/2017, Room 100, SH, 09:40 am; SC 9
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 5