+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/06/2013; Chapter 0058; Effective 08/05/2013
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled; HJ38, PG.1257
- Ought to Pass: MA VV; HJ38, PG.1243
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 24 (Vote 16-0; CC); HC33, PG.1094
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 4/16/2013 1:00 PM LOB 301
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 4/9/2013 10:15 AM LOB 301
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; HJ31, PG.1073
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0045s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 4
- Committee Amendment 0045s, AA, VV; SJ 4
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0045s, 1/31/13; SC6
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 1/23/13, Room 102, LOB, 9:00 a.m.; SC5
On January 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Public & Municipal Affairs; SJ 4
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor