+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On September 6, 2023 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2023 01:15 pm LOB 302-304 HC 36
On August 30, 2023 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/06/2023 01:15 pm LOB 302-304
On May 10, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On May 3, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/10/2023 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On April 27, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 05/03/2023 01:15 pm LOB 302-304
On April 12, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/19/2023 01:15 pm LOB 302-304
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/22/2023; SJ 8
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/22/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 11
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/14/2023, Room 100, SH, 09:15 am; SC 9
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 5
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor