+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On August 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/28/2023; Chapter 0170; Effective 11/01/2023
On June 30, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 HJ 17 P. 16
On June 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/29/2023); SJ 20
On June 8, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 06/08/2023 HJ 15 P. 4
On May 12, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/10/2023 (Vote 18-0; CC)
On May 3, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/10/2023 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On April 27, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 05/03/2023 10:10 am LOB 302-304
On April 5, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/12/2023 11:30 am LOB 302-304
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/16/2023; SC 13
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/09/2023; SJ 6
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/09/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 9
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/31/2023, Room 100, SH, 09:15 am; SC 8
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 5