+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 3
On May 16, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 05/15/2024 (Vote 18-0; CC) HC 20 P. 5
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/15/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On May 1, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 05/08/2024 01:15 pm LOB 302-304
On April 9, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/30/2024 01:15 pm LOB 302-304
On February 29, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 6 P. 137
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 01/03/2024; SJ 1
On December 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/03/2024, Vote 4-0; SC 49
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV; 02/09/2023; SJ 6
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 02/09/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 9A
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/07/2023, Room 100, SH, 09:45 am; SC 9
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor