+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Law Without Signature 05/09/15; Eff. Date 07/08/15, Chapter 0041; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled; HJ 36, PG. 1597
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 4/9/2015); SJ 12
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA DV 186-155; HJ 34, PG. 1554
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Apr 15 (Vote 15-6; RC); HC 29, PG. 1308
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/31/2015 1:00 PM LOB 207
- Public Hearing: 3/31/2015 9:30 AM LOB 207
- Introduced and Referred to Education (in recess of 3/12/2015); HJ 26, PG. 1276
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, MF, VV; SJ 9
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0922s, NT, MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 9
- Sen. Stiles moved Ought to Pass; SJ 9
- Sen. Stiles Floor Amendment #2015-0922s, NT, AA, VV
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 3/19/15; SC13
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0449s, NT, MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; SJ 7
- Committee Amendment 0449s, NT, AA, VV
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0449s, NT, 3/5/15; SC11
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 2/10/15, Room 103, LOB, 9:40 a.m.; SC8
On January 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Education; SJ 4