+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 09/03/2019; Chapter 336; Effective 09/03/2019
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/13/2019 HJ 19 P. 18
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); SJ 21
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sen. Cavanaugh Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 05/30/2019; SJ 18
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1741h: MA RC 221-132 05/08/2019 HJ 15 P. 15
- Amendment # 2019-1741h: AA VV 05/08/2019 HJ 15 P. 15
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1741h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 14-6; RC) HC 23 P. 8
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 04/30/2019 01:30 pm LOB 302
- Full Committee Work Session: 04/30/2019 09:30 am LOB 302
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 04/18/2019 10:00 am LOB 302
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/18/2019 01:00 pm LOB 302
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 04/17/2019 10:00 am LOB 302
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 04/10/2019 10:00 am LOB 302
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/02/2019 01:45 pm LOB 302
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 11 P. 70
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendments 2019-0382s, and 2019-0510s, RC 21Y-2N, MA; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; SJ 5
- Sen. Watters Floor Amendment # 2019-0510s, AA, VV; 02/14/2019; SJ 5
- Committee Amendment # 2019-0382s, AA, VV; 02/14/2019; SJ 5
- Special Order to After Energy and Natural Resources, Without Objection, MA; 02/14/2019; SJ 5
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0382s, 02/14/2019; SC 10
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/05/2019, Room 100, SH, 01:00 pm; SC 9
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 4
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 8, 2019: OTPA
- Yeas: 221
- Nays: 132
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 38
February 14, 2019: Ought to Pass w/Amendment
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 23
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor