+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2023; Chapter 0077; Effective 06/07/2023
On May 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 05/18/2023); SJ 16
On May 31, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 04/18/2023
On May 4, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/04/2023 HJ 13 P. 20
On April 27, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/26/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC)
On April 19, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/26/2023 01:30 pm LOB 202-204
On April 4, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/18/2023 11:30 am LOB 202-204
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Ways and Means
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0271s, AA, VV; 02/09/2023; SJ 6
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0271s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/09/2023; SJ 6
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0271s, 02/09/2023; SC 9
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/01/2023, Room 100, SH, 09:30 am; SC 8
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Ways and Means; SJ 5