+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2013; Chapter 0133; Effective 06/25/2013
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled; HJ49, PG.1652
- Ought to Pass: MA VV; HJ49, PG.1569
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for June 5 (Vote 23-0; CC); HC42, PG.1428
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 5/29/2013 10:00 AM LOB 210-211
- Division II Work Session: 5/28/2013 11:00 AM LOB 209
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Finance; HJ41, PG.1392
- Ought to Pass: MA VV; HJ41, PG.1392
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 8 (Vote 15-3; CC); HC36, PG.1199
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 4/24/2013 1:00 PM LOB 201 ==Or Immediately Following House Session==
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 4/23/2013 10:30 AM LOB 201
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 4/16/2013 10:30 AM LOB 201
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Public Works and Highways; HJ31, PG.1075
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0764s, NT, MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 7
- Committee Amendment 0764s, NT, AA, VV; SJ 7
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0764s, NT, 3/14/13; SC11
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 2/12/13, Room 103, SH, 1:15 p.m.; SC8
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Finance; SJ 5