+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/30/2023; Chapter 0139; Effective 06/30/2023
On June 20, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/15/2023 HJ 16 P. 14
On June 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/15/2023); SJ 20
On June 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sen. Lang Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 06/01/2023; SJ 16
On May 18, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-1739h: AA VV 05/18/2023 HJ 14
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1739h: MA VV 05/18/2023 HJ 14
On May 11, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1739h (NT) 05/09/2023 (Vote 19-0; CC)
On May 4, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2023-1606h: 05/09/2023 09:00 am LOB 202-204
On May 3, 2023 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/09/2023 10:00 am LOB 202-204
On April 27, 2023 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/03/2023 10:45 am LOB 202-204
- Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2023-1475h: 05/03/2023 10:30 am LOB 202-204
On April 19, 2023 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/26/2023 01:30 pm LOB 202-204
On April 4, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/18/2023 10:30 am LOB 202-204
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Ways and Means
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/09/2023; SJ 6
On January 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/09/2023; SC 9
On January 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/18/2023, Room 100, SH, 09:00 am; SC 6
On January 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Ways and Means; SJ 4
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor