+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/09/2013; Chapter 0204; Effective 07/09/2013
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, Recess of 6/5/13; HJ49, PG.1652
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment #2013-2019e Adopted, VV
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment #2019e Adopted [Recess of 6/5/13]; HJ49, PG.1648
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sen. Boutin Moved Concur with House Amendment 1275h, MA, VV
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #1275h: MA RC 336-0; HJ38, PG.1254-1256
- Reconsideration (Rep P.Sullivan): MA DIV 255-79; HJ38, PG.1253
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #1275h: MA RC 344-2; HJ38, PG.1248-1250
- Amendment #1275h: AA VV; HJ38, PG.1248
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-1275h; HC33, PG.1114
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1275h for April 24 (Vote 18-0; RC); HC33, PG.1097
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 4/16/2013 11:00 AM LOB 208
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 4/11/2013 11:00 AM LOB 208
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; HJ31, PG.1075
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0801s, NT, MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 7
- Committee Amendment 0801s, NT, AA, VV; SJ 7
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0801s, 3/14/13; SC11
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 3/6/13, Room 102, LOB, 9:30 a.m.; SC10
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Public & Municipal Affairs; SJ 5
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor