+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, MA, VV === BILL KILLED ===; 02/22/2023; SJ 8
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/22/2023; SC 11
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/31/2023, Room 101, LOB, 02:30 pm; SC 8
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Transportation; SJ 5