+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On July 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 240; Effective 07/12/2019
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/27/2019 HJ 20 P. 53
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); SJ 21
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sen. Watters Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 06/13/2019; SJ 20
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 06/05/2019 HJ 17 P. 61
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 06/05/2019 (Vote 22-0; RC) HC 27 P. 15
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/29/2019 10:00 am LOB 210-211
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Division II Work Session: 05/21/2019 10:00 am LOB 209
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Finance 05/08/2019 HJ 15 P. 38
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1618h (NT): MA VV 05/08/2019 HJ 15 P. 38
- Amendment # 2019-1618h (NT): AA VV 05/08/2019 HJ 15 P. 38
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1618h (NT) for 05/08/2019 (Vote 18-1; RC) HC 23 P. 11
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/24/2019 11:30 am LOB 201-203
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/17/2019 11:00 am LOB 201
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Public Works and Highways HJ 11 P. 70
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; SJ 7
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/07/2019; SC 12
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0209s, RC 23Y-0N, MA; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/14/2019; SJ 5
- Committee Amendment # 2019-0209s, AA, VV; 02/14/2019; SJ 5
- Special Order to the Present Time, Without Objection, MA; 02/14/2019; SJ 5
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0209s, 02/14/2019; SC 10
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/29/2019, Room 103, LOB, 02:15 pm; SC 8
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Transportation; SJ 4
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
February 14, 2019: Ought to Pass w/Amendment
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 23
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor