+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, MA, VV === BILL KILLED ===; 03/09/2023; SJ 9
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Special Order to 03/09/2023, Without Objection, MA; 02/22/2023 SJ 8
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/09/2023; SC 12
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/22/2023; SC 11
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/07/2023, Room 100, SH, 02:10 pm; SC 9
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 5