+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Refer to Interim Study, MA, VV; 01/03/2024; SJ 1
On December 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/03/2024, Vote 6-0; SC 49
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/16/2023; SC 13
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/22/2023; SJ 8
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/22/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 11
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/01/2023, Room 101, LOB, 09:15 am; SC 8
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 5