+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/03/2024; Chapter 0144; Effective 01/01/2025
On June 25, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 45
On June 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 3
On May 15, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/15/2024 (Vote 18-0; CC) HC 20 P. 5
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/15/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On May 1, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 05/07/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On April 9, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/23/2024 11:00 am LOB 302-304
On February 29, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 6 P. 137
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2023-2418s, AA, VV; 01/03/2024; SJ 1
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-2418s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 01/03/2024; SJ 1
On December 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-2418s, 01/03/2024, Vote 5-0; SC 49
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/16/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 13
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/08/2023, Room 101, LOB, 09:15 am; SC 9
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 5
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor